This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/17/2021 at 22:28:23 (UTC).

Sharifi v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Sharifi filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Meiers, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0867

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Meiers, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gholamreza Sharifi

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Barbara Ann Meiers

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Behnaz Diabi

IQ Textiles, Ind. Inc.

Zia Abhari

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sassan Amir Mackay

Attorney at Commerce Law Group

1120 W La Palma Ave Ste 6

Anaheim, CA 92801

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Christopher G. Weston

Attorney at Western Law Connection Corp.

29171 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed March 9, 2021. The petition for writ of review is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Lavin, Acting, P. J., Egerton, J., and Salter, J.* *Judge of the Orange Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Counsel for petitioner re: Status request for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service. Petition served on Real Party In Interest and Judge Meiers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Petitioner's proof of service re Exhibits served on the Real Party In Interest and Judge Meiers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Writ of Mandate-STAY Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IQ TEXTILES IND. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKAY SASSAN AMIR