This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/21/2022 at 02:17:17 (UTC).

SHANNON (JON) ON H.C.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 SHANNON JON ON H C was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4651

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jon Shannon

Jamestown, CA 95327

Respondent

California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Attorney General - Los Angeles Office

300 South Spring Street, Suite 5000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Jon Shannon Pro Per (CRC 8.25(b))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B319854; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: KA068043; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: KA103214

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant