This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/24/2023 at 12:02:23 (UTC).

Shamiya et al. v. Daly City Venue Managment Services, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Shamiya filed an Other lawsuit against Daly City Venue Managment Services, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weiner, Marie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5761

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weiner, Marie

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Issa Shamiya

Nimra Shamiya

Respondents and Defendants

Daly City Venue Managment Services, Inc.

Mark Johnson

Kevin Tuck

Roark and Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Ryan Patrick

Andrew J. Wiegel

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Robert David Bolls, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2022

DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2022

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request to dismiss returned with message: The request to dismiss submitted for the above-named case has been returned, unfiled. The record is not yet with this court in either of the above-named cases. Please submit an abandonment of appeal to superior court pursuant to CRC 8.244(b)(1), and then provide us with an endorsed copy so that we may close out your case(s). The form can be found here: https://www.courts.ca.gov/documents/app005.pdf. Appellant counsel also notified via email.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed in Superior Court on 8/8/22 CT and RT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed in Superior Court on 8/23/22 Proceeding by CT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Issa Shamiya Attorney: G. Ryan Patrick Plaintiff and Appellant: Nimra Shamiya Attorney: G. Ryan Patrick Order attached.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Issa ShamiyaAttorney: G. Ryan Patrick Plaintiff and Appellant: Nimra ShamiyaAttorney: G. Ryan Patrick; Notes: Order attached.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement missing copy of order or judgement being appealed Received 8/26/22 Rejected 8/26/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 6172, Wiegel Law Group

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/01/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiffs Issa J. Shamiya and Nimra I. Shamiya appealing order from 06/15/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 20UDU00297; Trial Court Judge: Weiner, Marie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less