This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/23/2023 at 01:28:02 (UTC).

Shalgoun v. County of Los Angeles

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 Shalgoun filed an Other lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Young, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3186

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Young, Mark

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ali Shalgoun

Defendant and Respondent

County of Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Nancy P. Doumanian

Attorney at Doumanian & Associates

837 South Fair Oaks Ave Suite 200

Pasadena, CA 91105

Sharon J. Arkin

Attorney at The Arkin Law Firm

1720 Winchuck River Road

Brookings, OR 97415

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jennifer E. Gysler

Attorney at Monroy, Averbuck & Gysler

32123 Lindero Canyon Road, Suite 301

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Sueanne Denise Chadbourne

Attorney at Beach Law Group, LLP

500 E Esplanade Dr Ste 1400

Oxnard, CA 93036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/19/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ali Shalgoun Attorney: Nancy P. Doumanian Attorney: Sharon J. Arkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Sharon J. Arkin of The Arkin Lae Firm associates in as co-counsel of record for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 05/19/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ali ShalgounAttorney: Nancy P. Doumanian Attorney: Sharon J. Arkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ali ShalgounAttorney: Nancy P. Doumanian Attorney: Sharon J. Arkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant $775 filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 29, 2022: The appellant in this case has not been granted a waiver of the fees for preparing a clerk's transcript. I elect under rule 8.124(a) to use an appendix in lieu of a clerk's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on August 18, 2022 by Ali Shalgoun.notice of designation of record included within notice of appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV19756; Trial Court Judge: Young, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less