This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/26/2023 at 01:19:55 (UTC).

Shakespeare v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Co.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Shakespeare filed an Other lawsuit against National Steel and Shipbuilding Co. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacal, Katherine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1270

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bacal, Katherine

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Archie Shakespeare

Appellant and Defendant

National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Other

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Roald Kindem

Lonnie Clifford Blanchard

Jeff Holmes

Norman B. Blumenthal

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

E. Joseph Connaughton

Evan Alexander Pena

Other Attorneys

Office Of The District Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-2 (492 pages); RT-1 (13 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 2/6/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 1/23/23 (designate with specificity...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/8/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed Nov. 28, 2022 by NASSCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2021-00013962-CU-OE-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Bacal, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less