This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/05/2023 at 07:03:36 (UTC).

Shakespeare v. National Steel and Shipbuilding Co.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Shakespeare filed an Other lawsuit against National Steel and Shipbuilding Co. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacal, Katherine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1270

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bacal, Katherine

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Archie Shakespeare

Defendant and Appellant

National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Other

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Roald Kindem

Attorney at The Dion-Kindem Law Firm

2945 Townsgate Rd., Ste. 200

Westlake Village, CA 91361-5866

Lonnie Clifford Blanchard

Attorney at BLANCHARD LAW GROUP, APC

5211 E Washington Blvd #2262

Los Angeles, CA 90040

Norman B. Blumenthal

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug & Bhowmik

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037-2431

Jeff Holmes

1613 Chelsea Rd Ste 238

San Marino, CA 91108-2419

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Evan Alexander Pena

Attorney at Paul, Plevin, Sullivan & Connaughton LLP

101 West Broadway, 9Th Fl.

San Diego, CA 92101

E. Joseph Connaughton

Attorney at Paul Plevin Sullivan & Connaughton, LLP

101 West Broadway, 9Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-8285

Other Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Office Of The District Attorney

Appellate Division P. O. Box X-1011

San Diego, CA 92112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 2/6/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 1/23/23 (designate with specificity...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/8/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed Nov. 28, 2022 by NASSCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2021-00013962-CU-OE-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Bacal, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less