This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/01/2023 at 16:03:10 (UTC).

Serdy v. Alnasser et al.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Serdy filed an Other lawsuit against Alnasser. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Henry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4924

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Walsh, Henry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Shay Serdy

Appellants and Defendants

Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser, Dr.

Sumaya 369 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Christine C. Lyden

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Stuart W. Price

 

Court Documents

B314924

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The trial court's order denying Appellants' anti-SLAPP motion to strike Serdy's complaint for malicious prosecution, entered August 24, 2021, is affirmed. Serdy shall recover her costs on appeal. (10)(NFP)(YGP); Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Yegan, Kenneth R.; Participants: Gilbert, Arthur (Concur) Perren, Steven Z. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The trial court's order denying Appellants' anti-SLAPP motion to strike Serdy's complaint for malicious prosecution, entered August 24, 2021, is affirmed. Serdy shall recover her costs on appeal. (10)(NFP)(YGP)Request for judicial notice granted in opinion (pg 3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter dated 6-13-2022 by attorney S. Price re: citations to record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Thursday, June 9, 2022 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument continued to:; Notes: On the Court's own motion, oral argument in the above-referenced matter is CONTINUED to THURSDAY, JUNE 9, 2022 at 1:30 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Christine Lyden for respondent / 15 mins.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Stuart Price for aplts. Alnasser et al. / 30 mins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday, June 8, 2022 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.122(c) clerk's fees not deposited. Dated:; Notes: 10-26-2021 by VCSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice rescinding default dated 10-8-2021 by VCSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser, Dr. Attorney: Stuart W. Price Defendant and Appellant: Sumaya 369 LLC Attorney: Stuart W. Price

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 9-22-2021; CT and RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser, Dr.Attorney: Stuart W. Price Defendant and Appellant: Sumaya 369 LLCAttorney: Stuart W. Price

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Failure to designate clerk's transcript dated 9-22-2021 by VCSC / must cure by 10-7-2021 Failure to designate reporter's transcript dated 9-22-2021 by VCSC /must cure by 10-7-2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 9-9-21 by aplts. Alnasser and Sumaya 369 LLC, from 8-24-21 order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2020-00545893-CU-PO-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Walsh, Henry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less