This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/03/2021 at 00:04:50 (UTC).

Sepehry-Fard v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Sepehry-Fard filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9373

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rudy, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fareed Sepehry-Fard

Saratoga, CA 95070

Respondents

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Bernard J. Kornberg

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jan T. Chilton

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

Adam N. Barasch

Mary Kate Sullivan

Interested Parties and Respondents

Bernard J. Kornberg

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jan T. Chilton

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

Adam N. Barasch

U.S. Bank National Association

MaryKate Sullivan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Bernard Jaron Kornberg

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jan T. Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

Adam Neil Barasch

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Center Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94111

MaryKate Sullivan

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr #2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate or prohibition is denied. (MJG, PBM, AMD participated in this decision.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The application for waiver of court fees and costs is granted only as to the filing fee due on the petition for writ of mandate filed August 27, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition on respondents. No service on respondents Adam N. Barasch, Mary Kate Sullivan, U.S. Bank National Association.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or prohibition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN MARYKATE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARASCH, ADAM N.