This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/27/2022 at 19:00:28 (UTC).

Seo v. Park et al.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Seo filed an Other lawsuit against Park. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Melzer, Layne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9444

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Melzer, Layne

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Youngjin Seo

Appellants and Defendants

Yung Ki Park

SC&P Resources, Inc.

Other

Attorney General's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E. Park

Attorney at Daniel E. Park Law Corporation

201 N Band Blvd. Suite 200

Glendale, CA 91203

Anna Sophie Tirre

Attorney at Daniel E Park Law Corporation

201 N Brand Blvd Unit 200

Glendale, CA 91203

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Bub-Joo Salvador Lee

Attorney at Lee Anav Chung White Kim Ruger & Richter LLP

520 S Grand Ave Ste 1070

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2613

Steven S. Wang

Attorney at Parker Mills LLP

800 W. 6Th Street Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David P. Parker

Attorney at Parker Mills LLP

800 W 6Th St Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

G059444

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is affirmed. (Bedsworth)/O'Leary/Marks; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Bedsworth, William W.; Participants: Marks, Linda S. (Concur) O'Leary, Kathleen E. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. (Bedsworth)/O'Leary/Marks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause called. Steven Wang argued for appellants. Daniel Park argued for respondent. Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Steven Wang will argue for appellants- 20 minutes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Anna-Sophie Tirre will argue for respondent - 30 minutes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).; Notes: As to 1st appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellants' 1st and 2nd appeals

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 2nd appeal filed 09/23/2020. Appellant SC & P Resources elects to proceed by rule 8.124 an appendix w/out RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 1st appeal filed 09/25/2020. Appellant Yung Ki Park elects to proceed by rule 8.124 an appendix w/out RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent rescinding 8.220(a) notice.; Notes: As to 2nd appellant SC&P Resources, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: 1st appeal Aplt Yung Ki Park

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: 2nd appellant SC&P Resources, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 2nd notice of appeal: Appellant SC&P Resources, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt Yung Ki Park

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01050002; Trial Court Judge: Melzer, Layne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SC&P Resources, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Office of the Attorney General is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK DANIEL EAL