This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/06/2021 at 04:56:44 (UTC).

Senior and Disability Action v. Padilla

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Senior and Disability Action filed an Other lawsuit against Padilla. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9540

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Senior and Disability Action

American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California

Alice Chiu

Disability Rights California

Defendant and Respondent

Alex Padilla

Amicus Curiae

Horvitz & Levy, LLP

California Academy of Appellate Lawyers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Shilpi Agarwal

Attorney at ACLU of Northern California

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Anne O Decker

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California

39 Drumm Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Navneet Kaur Grewal

Attorney at Disability Rights California

350 S. Bixel Street, Suite 290

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Frederick Philip Nisen

Attorney at Disability Rights California

1330 Broadway, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-2509

Benjamin Thomas Conway

Attorney at Disability Rights California

1330 Broadway, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

Paul R. Spencer

Attorney at Disability Rights California

1330 Broadway, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Mitchell Tilner

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Ave., 8Th Flr.

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Lisa Perrochet

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Avenue 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Rex S. Heinke

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6022

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono Highsmith & Whatley PC

420 Sierra College Drive - Suite 140

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Dennis A. Fischer

1448 - 15Th St. Ste. 206

Santa Monica, CA 90404

Robert Gerstein

12400 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kirk C. Jenkins

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy, LLP

3601 West Olive Avennue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Robin B. Johansen

Attorney at Olson Remcho LLP

1901 Harrison Street, Suite 1550

Oakland, CA 94612

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Scott M. Reddie

Attorney at McCormick Barstow LLP

7647 N. Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Richard A. Rothschild

Attorney at Western Center On Law And Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard - Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

A159540

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is affirmed. The parties are to bear their own costs on appeal.; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Wiseman, Rebecca A.; Participants: Jackson, Teri L. (Concur) Petrou, Ioana (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) The judgment is affirmed. The parties are to bear their own costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: March 11, 2021, at 10:00am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Shilpi Agarwal for appellants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 20-10.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Senior and Disability Action Attorney: Anne O Decker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Senior and Disability Action Attorney: Shilpi Agarwal with judgment attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Senior and Disability ActionAttorney: Shilpi Agarwal Plaintiff and Appellant: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California Plaintiff and Appellant: Disability Rights CaliforniaAttorney: Frederick Philip Nisen Plaintiff and Appellant: Alice Chiu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Senior and Disability ActionAttorney: Shilpi Agarwal; Notes: with judgment attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid via Credit Card, Front Counter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(attached to designation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/16/19. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/12/19 by Counsel for Plaintiff Senior and Disability Action appealing judgment from 10/22/19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF18516265; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California is a litigant

Latest cases where DISABILITY RIGHTS CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where HORVITZ & LEVY LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis A. Fischer