Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/07/2021 at 05:04:53 (UTC).

Sempra Energy v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Sempra Energy filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Buckley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9989

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 5

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Buckley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Interested Parties

Alan L. Boeckmann et. al.

Pearson, MD, et al.

Abate, et al

Kitahara, et al.

Group 3 - Service List C

Cruz, et. al.

Martin Balabegians, et al.

Coe et al.

Rhonda Kanter

Arlander Flavors, et al.

Chehata, et al.

Naaman, et al.

Gevshenian, et al.

The Termo Company

Dolabjian, et al.

Allaudin, et al.

Abernathy, et al.

Aguilar, et al.

Achoyan, et al.

Ash, et al.

125 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Allen L Lanstra

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom

300 South Grand Avenue, Ste. 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shehnaz Bhujwala

Attorney at Boucher LLP

21600 Oxnard Street Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Other Attorneys

Wayne McClean

Attorney at Law Offices Of Wayne McClean

21650 Oxnard Street Suite 1620

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-4006

Gregory G. Petersen

Attorney at Gregory G. Peterson, Attorney At Law

2618 San Miguel Drive, Suite 458

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Alex Myung Cha

Attorney at Law Offices of Alex Cha & Associates

707 Wilshire Blvd., 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Paul R. Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Deanne L. Miller

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

300 South Grand Ave. Twenty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Michael Lawrence Schrag

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group

505 14Th St Ste 1110

Oakland, CA 94612-1406

Phillip A. Baker

Attorney at Baker Keener & Nahra

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 5500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ara Aroustamian

Attorney at Aroustamian & Associates

100 W. Boardway, Ste. 540

Glendale, CA 91210-1527

John Conner Heintz

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

355 South Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Andre E. Jardini

Attorney at Knapp, Petersen & Clarke

550 North Brand Blvd. Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203-1922

Sawsan Mansour

11620 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Gary C. Eisenberg

5010 North Oarkway Calabasas Suite 100

Calabasas, CA 91302-4179

Brian J. Panish

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Armand Raffi Kizirian

Attorney at Boyamian Law Inc

550 N Brand Blvd Ste 1500

Glendale, CA 91203-1922

M. Lynda Sheridan

Attorney at Law Offices of Massa

1801 Century Park East Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Felix Shih-Young Lee

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California St

Mountain View, CA 94041

Martin Thomas McCormack

Attorney at WilmerHale LLP

One Front Street Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel L. Germain

Attorney at Rosman & Germain

16311 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 91436-2152

205 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reponse to Plaintiff's preliminary opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Real Parties in Interest William Gandsey et al. and Toll Brothers, Inc. et al.Toll Brothers, Inc. responsive filing fee paid via credit card; Retained Counsel, Mark C. Holscher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real Parties in Interest William Gandsey et al. and Toll Brothers, Inc. et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition re petition for writ of mandate on behalf of Real Parties in Interest William Gandsey et al. and Toll Brothers, Inc. et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 26 [SEALED]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 16, 19, 20, and 21 with bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Via FedEx - 1) Notice of Lodging Electronic Exhibits re Petition for Writ of Mandate, 2) Notice of Lodging Exhibits Volumes 26 [SEALED] re Petition for Writ of Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Volumes 6, 7, 8, 9, 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Attorney Levine - the parties identified on the proof of service are the parties involved in the action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL RE:PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 22 through 25 of 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 19 through 21 of 26- (NO BOOKMARKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 18 of 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 16 through 17 of 26- (NO BOOKMARKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 11 through 15 of 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 6 through 10 of 26- (NO BOOKMARKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 5 of 26- (NO BOOKMARKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 4 of 26- (NO BOOKMARKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 1 through 3 of 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pearson, MD, et al. is a litigant