Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 06/08/2021 at 03:14:36 (UTC).

Sempra Energy et al. v. Buckley et al.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Sempra Energy filed an Other lawsuit against Buckley. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Buckley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0248

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 5

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Buckley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Interested Party

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Interested Parties

Alan L. Boeckmann et. al.

Pearson, MD, et al.

Abate, et al

Kitahara, et al.

Group 3 - Service List C

Cruz, et. al.

Martin Balabegians, et al.

Coe et al.

Rhonda Kanter

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Arlander Flavors, et al.

Chehata, et al.

Naaman, et al.

Gevshenian, et al.

The Termo Company

Alturk, et al.

Dolabjian, et al.

Allaudin, et al.

Abernathy, et al.

Almeda et al.

San Diego, CA 92121

126 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Deanne L. Miller

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Ave. Twenty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Interested Party Attorneys

Allen L Lanstra

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom

300 South Grand Avenue, Ste. 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shehnaz Bhujwala

Attorney at Boucher LLP

21600 Oxnard Street Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

John Conner Heintz

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

355 South Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Kali Vitoria Fournier

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy LLP

2716 Ocean Park Blvd, Ste 3088

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Alreen Haeggquist

Attorney at Haeggquist & Eck, LLP

225 Broadway Ste 2050

San Diego, CA 92101-5096

Other Attorneys

Wayne McClean

Attorney at Law Offices Of Wayne McClean

21650 Oxnard Street Suite 1620

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-4006

Gregory G. Petersen

Attorney at Gregory G. Peterson, Attorney At Law

2618 San Miguel Drive, Suite 458

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Alex Myung Cha

Attorney at Law Offices of Alex Cha & Associates

707 Wilshire Blvd., 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Paul R. Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Michael Lawrence Schrag

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group

505 14Th St Ste 1110

Oakland, CA 94612-1406

Walter John Lack

Attorney at Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4107

Julie Lynn Fieber

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Rd

Burlingame, CA 94010

Phillip A. Baker

Attorney at Baker Keener & Nahra

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 5500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ara Aroustamian

Attorney at Aroustamian & Associates

100 W. Boardway, Ste. 540

Glendale, CA 91210-1527

Andre E. Jardini

Attorney at Knapp, Petersen & Clarke

550 North Brand Blvd. Suite 1500

Glendale, CA 91203-1922

Sawsan Mansour

11620 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Gary C. Eisenberg

5010 North Oarkway Calabasas Suite 100

Calabasas, CA 91302-4179

Brian J. Panish

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Armand Raffi Kizirian

Attorney at Boyamian Law Inc

550 N Brand Blvd Ste 1500

Glendale, CA 91203-1922

205 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including June 18, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied. [S267774]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Certificate of Service [S267774]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: [S267774]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed February 5, 2021, the preliminary opposition filed February 16, 2021, and the reply filed February 22, 2021. The petition is denied. Petitioners fail to demonstrate that the respondent court erred in denying their motion for summary adjudication. Petitioners have not demonstrated punitive damages are not recoverable as a matter of law.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Corrected certificate of service re: petitioner's reply to plaintiff's preliminary opposition to petition for writ re motion for summary adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply to Opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real Parties in Interest William Gandsey et al.'s opposition re petition for writ of prohibition of other appropriate relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, MANDATE, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Volumes 21 - 24, (Out of 26 Volumes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, MANDATE, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Volumes 11 - 20, (Out of 26 Volumes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF PROHIBITION, MANDATE, OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Volumes 1 - 10, (Out of 26 Volumes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of lodging exhibits under seal pursuant to court order RE petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of lodging exhibits under seal pursuant to court order RE petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pearson, MD, et al. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant