This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/07/2021 at 11:24:49 (UTC).

SEMPRA ENERGY CORP. v. S.C. (GANDSEY)

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 SEMPRA ENERGY CORP filed an Other lawsuit against C GANDSEY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7775

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Interested Parties

Alan L. Boeckmann et. al.

Kitahara, et al.

Group 3 - Service List C

Martin Balabegians, et al.

Rhonda Kanter

Arlander Flavors, et al.

Chehata, et al.

The Termo Company

Dolabjian, et al.

Allaudin, et al.

Abernathy, et al.

Aguilar, et al.

Achoyan, et al.

Tahmassian, et al.

Counsel for Plaintiffs in Steven Collis v. Sempra Energy, et al.;

Bernard Levine, et al.

Heller, et al.

Jackson, et al.

Toll Brothers, Inc.

Jamie Kimmel, et al.

118 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Allen L Lanstra

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom

300 South Grand Avenue, Ste. 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shehnaz Bhujwala

Attorney at Boucher LLP

21600 Oxnard Street Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Shane Erin Greenberg

Attorney at Morris Law Firm

4001 W Alameda Ave Ste 208

Burbank, CA 91505-4338

Austin C. Norris

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park E Ste 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3211

Other Attorneys

Paul R. Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Deanne L. Miller

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

300 South Grand Ave. Twenty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Michael Lawrence Schrag

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612-1406

Michael Vahe Jehdian

Attorney at Law Office of Michael V Jehdian

550 N Brand Blvd Ste 2150

Glendale, CA 91203-1934

Sawsan Mansour

11620 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Gary C. Eisenberg

5010 North Oarkway Calabasas Suite 100

Calabasas, CA 91302-4179

Robert S. Scuderi

Attorney at Attorney at Law

15315 Magnolia Blvd #430

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Brian J. Panish

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Mickel Montalban Arias

Attorney at Arias Ozzello & Gignac LLP

6701 Center Dr West, Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Felix Shih-Young Lee

Attorney at Fenwich & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Martin Thomas McCormack

Attorney at WilmerHale LLP

One Front Street Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel L. Germain

Attorney at Rosman & Germain

16311 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1200

Encino, CA 91436

Robert Vincent Prongay

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ardeshir Sarbaz

Attorney at SMS Law Group, LLP

7360 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 200

West Hollywood, CA 90046

Michael E. Reznick

Attorney at Attorney at Law

283 Ocho Rios Way

Agoura Hills, CA 91377-5540

Anthony T Nehme

Attorney at NEHME LAW FIRM

800 West 6Th Street Suite 1410

Los Angeles, CA 90012

149 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Sempra Energy Corp. Attorney: David L. Schrader

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B309989; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC601844; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP4816

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Group 3 - Service List C is a litigant

Latest cases where TOLL BROTHERS, INC. is a litigant