This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/17/2023 at 23:03:28 (UTC).

SCOTT v. CREDIT CONSULTING SERVICES

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 SCOTT filed an Other lawsuit against CREDIT CONSULTING SERVICES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6438

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Clifton James Scott

Consumer Law Office of Robert Stempler

8200 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Fred W. Schwinn, Esq.

San Jose, CA 95113

Respondent and Cross Defendant

Credit Consulting Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Fred W. Schwinn

Attorney at Consumer Law Center, Inc.

38 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Robert Stempler

Attorney at Consumer Law Office of Robert Stempler

8200 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Raeon Rodrigo Roulston

Attorney at Consumer Law Center, Inc.

38 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mark Ewell Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Group LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Paul William Moncrief

Attorney at Moncrief & Hart, PC

16 West Gabilan Street

Salinas, CA 93901

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed); Notes: The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Fred W. Schwinn, Esq. Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Consumer Law Office of Robert Stempler Attorney: Robert Stempler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H049063; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: San Benito County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: CL1800541

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Consulting Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Mark Ewell