This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 00:49:28 (UTC).

Schoensiegel v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Schoensiegel filed an Other lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Meiers, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4633

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Meiers, Barbara

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Caitlin Schoensiegel

Defendants and Respondents

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Kiyoko Robbins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Ali Sarah Carlsen

Attorney at Aegis Law Firm, PC

9811 Irvine Center Dr Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Sumithra Rao Roberts

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1 Century Plaza 2029 Century Park E Fl 35

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final B312628.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Documents refiled.; Notes: B312628.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: B312628. B314633. Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals, filed September 24, 2021; and the non-opposition thereto, filed October 13, 2021, have been read and considered. It is hereby ordered that the above appeals are consolidated for the purposes of briefing, oral argument and decision. All future filings shall be made under B312628. Appellants' opening brief and appendix shall be due 30 days from the filing of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Caitlin Schoensiegel Attorney: Ali Sarah Carlsen (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant is in default for failure to file a complete Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g), for the appeal filed August 2, 2021 (U). So that the Court can establish jurisdiction and appealability, the Court requires appellant to provide a fully completed statement with appropriate documents The enclosed form is being returned because it is lacking NO Signed order or Judgment being appealed.. A NEW PROOF OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED ON OPPOSING PARTY TO INCLUDE A COPY OF THE COMPLETE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT. (CRC rules 8.100(g)(2) & 8.25(a)(1) & (2)). If a Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days from the date of this notice, or it is not completely filled out or it is lacking the attachments as required, the court may impose sanctions, including dismissal on the grounds of non-compliance with rule 8.100(g), and failure to establish that this court has jurisdiction over the case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: NO Signed order or Judgment being appealed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Caitlin SchoensiegelAttorney: Ali Sarah Carlsen; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: 775.00 Filing Fee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant's notice filed in trial court on 8/10/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 8/2/2021 by Caitlin Schoensiegel ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV21537; Trial Court Judge: Meiers, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less