This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/18/2022 at 01:30:55 (UTC).

Schiffman v. PDTW, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Schiffman filed an Other lawsuit against PDTW, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6204

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Michael M. Schiffman

Thomas Wylde, LLC

Defendant and Appellant

PDTW, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Richard Byron Peddie

Attorney at Richard Byron Peddie PC

5051 Euclid Ave

Boulder, CO 80303

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Dimitrious P. Biller

Attorney at LDT Consulting, Inc.

15113 W. Sunset Blvd., Suite 9

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Nov 9, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed June 2, 2021, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed June 2, 2021 by PDTW, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC513911

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS WYLDE, LLC, a California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PDTW, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BILLER DIMITRIOS PETER