This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/05/2022 at 22:19:53 (UTC).

SAVE LAFAYETTE TREES v. EAST BAY REGIONAL PARK DISTRICT (PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY)

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 SAVE LAFAYETTE TREES filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against EAST BAY REGIONAL PARK DISTRICT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0303

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Save Lafayette Trees

Michael Dawson

David Kosters

Appellants and Petitioners

Michael Dawson

David Kosters

Respondents and Defendants

East Bay Regional Park District

Pacific Gas and Electric Company

City of Lafayette

Interested Party and Respondent

Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Alexis E. Krieg

Stephan C. Volker

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Tamara S. Galanter

Rachel J. Sater

Arthur F. Coon

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

Arthur F. Coon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 8, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Save Lafayette Trees Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Petitioner and Appellant: Michael Dawson Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Petitioner and Appellant: David Kosters Attorney: Stephan C. Volker

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021

DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: East Bay Regional Park District Attorney: Tamara S. Galanter Real Party in Interest and Respondent: Pacific Gas and Electric Company Attorney: Arthur F. Coon **Joint answer**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Save Lafayette Trees Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Petitioner and Appellant: Michael Dawson Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Petitioner and Appellant: David Kosters Attorney: Stephan C. Volker **FILED WITH PERMISSION**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021

DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Save Lafayette Trees Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Petitioner and Appellant: Michael Dawson Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Petitioner and Appellant: David Kosters Attorney: Stephan C. Volker Received timely petition. Counsel was asked to resubmit with an Application to File an Oversized Petition or comply to the exhibit limit.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: A156150; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1701909

[+] Read More [-] Read Less