This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/12/2023 at 02:05:25 (UTC).

SARUN v. DIGNITY HEALTH

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 SARUN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5789

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Tony Sarun

Respondent and Defendant

Dignity Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Gretchen Carpenter

Attorney at Carpenter Law

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 300

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Barry L. Kramer

Attorney at Law Office of Barry L. Kramer

9550 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 253

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Harvey Rochman

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, L L P

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Joanna S. McCallum

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Philips LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1614

Barry S. Landsberg

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Craig Steven Rutenberg

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied. Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tony Sarun Attorney: Gretchen Carpenter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Dignity Health Attorney: Barry S. Landsberg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tony Sarun Attorney: Gretchen Carpenter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Dignity Health Attorney: Barry S. Landsberg *Pursuant to rule 8.1120(b)(1), the Court of Appeal transmitted the request for publication to the Supreme Court with the recommendation that the opinion not be published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311909; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC483764

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUTENBERG CRAIG STEVEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rochman, Harvey L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joanna Sobol McCallum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landsberg, Barry S