This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/28/2022 at 06:15:08 (UTC).

Sarno et al. v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Sarno filed an Other lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Strickroth, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1368

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Strickroth, Michael

 

Party Details

Appellants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

John Sarno

Leslie Sarno

Plaintiffs, Respondents, Defendants and Appellants

Leslie Sarno

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Patricia Kramer

Attorney at Neasham & Kramer LLP

340 Palladio Pkwy Ste 535

Folsom, CA 95630

Jason John Curliano

Attorney at Buty & Curliano LLP

516 16Th Street

Oakland, CA 94612

Ondrej Likar

Attorney at Buty & Curliano

516 16Th St

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: A. Desmond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 5/23/2022 - Proceeding by rule 8.124 with RT's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS - missing judgment order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: aplts' John & Leslie Sarno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00942737; Trial Court Judge: Strickroth, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia Kramer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIKAR, ONDREJ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURLIANO, JASON J