This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/09/2022 at 01:31:48 (UTC).

Sargon Enterprises, Inc. v. Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Sargon Enterprises, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7232

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Sargon Enterprises, Inc.

Defendant and Respondent

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Blane Goodman

Attorney at Novian & Novian LLP

1801 Century Park E. Suite 1201

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2314

Farhad Novian

Attorney at Novian & Novian, L L P

1801 Century Park East Suite 1201

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Deborah F. Sirias

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, & Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jana I. Lubert

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W. 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed December 20, 2021, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (December 20, 2021 by Sargon Enterprises, Inc. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on December 20, 2021 by Sargon Enterprises, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARGON ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBERT JANA I

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIRIAS DEBORAH F.