This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/25/2022 at 21:14:02 (UTC).

SANTANA v. CA 2/6 (PEOPLE)

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 SANTANA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CA 2/6 PEOPLE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2670

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andres Santana

Crescent City, CA 95532

Respondent

Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, Division Six

200 East Santa Clara Street

Ventura, CA 93001

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Yun K. Lee

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: from Supreme Court of the United States re petition for writ of certiorari was filed on May 6, 2022 and placed on the docket May 19, 2022 as No. 21-7914.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for writ of Review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of review & application for stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Received additional document from the petitioner in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Document titled: "Petitioner's Pro Se Supplemental Brief and Motion for Leave at Issue in Writ of Review"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Exhibits: Clerk's Transcript/Record on Appeal case B299353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Exhibits to Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of review and request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Andres Santana Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yun K. Lee