This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/07/2022 at 05:06:26 (UTC).

Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services v. J.G. **FAST TRACK**

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services filed an Other lawsuit against J G FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garcia, Arthur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9648

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Garcia, Arthur

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services

Appellant and Defendant

J. G.

Not Yet Classified

J. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

105 E. Anapamu Street, Room 201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Paul Adam Swiller

1901 First Avenue Suite 228

San Diego, CA 92101

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Francene Rhodes Kelly

P.O. Box 2660

Santa Maria, CA 93457

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: **HIGH PRIORITY APPEAL - WIC J366.26**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. G. Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 08/26/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Santa Barbara County Department of Social ServicesAttorney: Office of the County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. G.Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/25/2022 By 10 Day(s) time to file aob ext to 7/25/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 07/25/2022 By 10 Day(s) req to extend time to file aob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/15/2022 By 21 Day(s) time to file aob extended to 7/15/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 07/15/2022 By 21 Day(s) req to extend time to file aob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty P. Swiller for aplt. J.G.; AOB + 30 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: DIGITAL CT -2 (428), RT-1 (123)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 04/12/2022 appellant J.G.; from 04/12/2022 order terminating parental rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Barbara County Superior Court - Main; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: 21JV00065; Trial Court Judge: Garcia, Arthur

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services is a litigant