This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/24/2022 at 06:08:52 (UTC).

Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services v. C.C. ***FAST TRACK***

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services filed an Other lawsuit against C C FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lavayen, Gustavo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1989

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lavayen, Gustavo

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services

Appellant and Defendant

C. C.

Not Yet Classified

E. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

105 E. Anapamu Street, Room 201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Melissa A. Chaitin

Attorney at Law Office of Melissa A. Chaitin

5404 Whitsett Avenue, Suite 112

Valley Village, CA 91607-1615

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Francene Rhodes Kelly

P.O. Box 2660

Santa Maria, CA 93457

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney M. Chaitin on behalf of appellant (AOB + 30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (675p. e-filed only); R-1 (75p.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 07/29/2022 by C.C; from termination of parental rights on 07/27/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Barbara County Superior Court - Main; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: 20JV00312; Trial Court Judge: Lavayen, Gustavo

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Barbara County Department of Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francene Rhodes Kelly