This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/23/2022 at 01:48:09 (UTC).

Sanchez v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Sanchez filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurwitz, Lon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1382

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hurwitz, Lon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sara Sanchez

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Lon F. Hurwitz Dept. C-20 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Terry Irving

John Topolewski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James L. Grandy

Attorney at Cullins & Grandy

23141 Verdugo Drive Ste 204

Laguna Hills, CA 92653-1341

Chanel P. Araujo

Attorney at Cullins & Grandy LLP

23141 Verdugo Dr Ste 204

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Mitchell C. Tilner

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy, LLP

3601 West Olive Ave, 8Th Flr

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Melissa B. Whalen

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 W Olive Ave 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Melissa B. Edelson

3601 W Olive Ave 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Interested Party Attorneys

Joseph Hawkins Low, IV

Attorney at THE LAW FIRM OF JOSEPH H LOW IV, INC

100 Oceangate Fl 12

Long Beach, CA 90802

Royce Jayson Borgeson

Attorney at Henderson & Borgeson

801 Garden St Ste 100

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply in support of petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of David M. Lechuga, PH.D. and supporting exhibit in support of opposition by RPI Terry Irving.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by RPI Terry Irving

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: Petitioner filed a petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition and a request for an immediate stay on May 12, 2022. Real parties in interest are invited to file a preliminary opposition or other informal response within 15 days of the date of this order. No fee is required for this response requested by this court. All trial court proceedings are STAYED pending further order of this court. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Bedsworth, J., and Marks, J.* *Judge of the Orange County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 1 vol. of exhibits pages 1-269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petitioner: Sara Sanchez Request for immediate stay 5/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORGESON ROYCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOW, JOSEPH H., IV