This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/29/2023 at 05:02:57 (UTC).

San Joaquin County Human Services Agency v. K.S.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 San Joaquin County Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against K S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alva, Jose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7778

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alva, Jose

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Joaquin County Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

K. S.

Not Yet Classified

J. S.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Shann S. Kennedy

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Alia Khan Abedelal

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/30/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, appellant's opening briefs due May 1, 2023, respondent's brief due 30 days thereafter. Any minor's brief due 10 days after respondent's brief. Appellant's reply brief due 20 days after respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 3 vols. paper Clerk's Transcript (799 pp.) 10 vols. electronic Reporter's Transcript (116 pp.) Appellant's opening brief due: May 1, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Kellie A. Gaff granted extension to 3/13/23. No further time will be granted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Kellie A. Gaff requesting extension to 3/13/23. Completed 0 of 2 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Brittny Bova granted extension to 2/21/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Brittny Bova requesting extension to 2/21/23. Completed 4 of 5 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, record to be received by 2/6/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 1/12/23. Termination of parental rights.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: STKJDDP20210000113; Trial Court Judge: Alva, Jose

[+] Read More [-] Read Less