This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/12/2023 at 16:00:38 (UTC).

San Joaquin County Human Services Agency v. A.M.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 San Joaquin County Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against A M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucaccini, Anthony. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7772

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucaccini, Anthony

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Joaquin County Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

A. M.

Not Yet Classified

E. M.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Alistair Sheaffer

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Meghan Rochee Grim

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michael Andrew Holtz

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2023

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion for leave to file a supplemental brief fails to make an adequate showing of good cause that an arguable issue exists. Accordingly, the motion for leave to file a supplemental brief is denied. The appeal filed on January 12, 2023, is dismissed pursuant to In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835. Hull, Acting P.J., Renner, J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: By appellant for leave to file a supplemental brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. M. Attorney: Meghan Rochee Grim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. M.Attorney: Meghan Rochee Grim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 3 vols. paper CT (794 pp.); 3 vols. electronic RT (32 pp.) Appellant's opening brief due: 6/5/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Meghan R. Grim appointed for appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: For appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Dawn A. Henson granted extension to 3/13/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Dawn A. Henson requesting extension to 3/13/23. Completed 5 hours of 10 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 1/12/23. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: STKJDDP20220000354; Trial Court Judge: Lucaccini, Anthony

[+] Read More [-] Read Less