This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/13/2021 at 03:21:58 (UTC).

Salari v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Salari filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcus, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3952

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Marcus, Stephen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ramin Salari

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen G. Larson

Koren L Bell

John S Lee

Andrew J. Bedigian

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Stephen Marcus

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Casey C. Higgins

Office of the Attorney General

Office of the District Attorney

Haralambos Stamatis Zoumberakis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingDescription: Reply filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingDescription: Written return filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Defendant/Petitioner Ramin Salari's Notice of the Superior Court's compliance with the alternative writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent court's letter dated September 9, 2021, re minute order attached in response to the alternative writ of mandate dated August 16, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Defendant/Petitioner Ramin Salari's Notice of the superior court's compliance with the alternative writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed August 3, 2021. We tentatively conclude as follows. Because the motion for disqualification filed by petitioner was timely and does, on its face, state legal grounds for disqualification, it should be assigned to a different judge for decision pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 170.3, subdivision (c). Accordingly, you are ordered to either: (a) After hearing the parties' positions on the matter pursuant to Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233, 1250, footnote 10, vacate your July 19, 2021 order striking the statement of disqualification and instead have the disqualification motion decided by another judge pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 170.3, subdivision (c); or (b) In the alternative, show cause before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90013, on November 3, 2021, why a peremptory writ ordering you to do so should not issue. The return to the petition, if any, shall be filed on or before September 13, 2021. A reply to the return, if any, shall be filed on or before October 13, 2021. If you comply with this writ by selecting alternative (a) above, you are directed to provide this court with a copy of your minute order setting forth such compliance. Petitioner shall also provide this court with a copy of any such minute order upon receipt. All other trial court proceedings are stayed pending resolution of this matter or further order of this court. We express no opinion as to the merits of petitioner's motion for disqualification. WITNESS THE HONORABLE LAMAR BAKER, Acting Presiding Justice of Division Five of the Court of Appeal of the State of California, Second Appellate District. ATTEST my hand and the seal of this court this 16th day of August 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The immediate stay request is denied. Petitioner fails to make an adequate showing of urgency.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 3 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 2 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Criminal Mandate - Vol 1 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Criminal Mandate (Stay Requested)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less