This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/07/2022 at 01:11:38 (UTC).

Sainte Claire Historic Preservation v. City of San Jose

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Sainte Claire Historic Preservation filed an Other lawsuit against City of San Jose. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0106

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucas, Patricia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Sainte Claire Historic Preservation

Sainte Claire Historic Preservation Foundation

Defendants and Respondents

City of San Jose

Mortimer & Mimi Levitt Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Susan Brandt-Hawley

Attorney at Brandt-Hawley Law Group

P.O. Box 1659

Glen Ellen, CA 95442-2046

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Margo Laskowska

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

City Of San Jose 200 East Santa Clara Street, 16Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Todd Arington Williams

Attorney at Wendel Rosen LLP

1111 Broadway 24Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Administrative record returned to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Record filing letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Administrative record received **********.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Submitted by S. Brandt-Hawley obo Appellant with judgment of 4/8/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sainte Claire Historic Preservation, filed 5/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV374459; Trial Court Judge: Lucas, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd A. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laskowska, Margo