This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 01:01:37 (UTC).

Tariwala et al. v. Mack

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Tariwala filed an Other lawsuit against Mack. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is O'Neill, Jr., Vincent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1232

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

O'Neill, Jr., Vincent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Fnu Husaina

Shabbir Saifee

Tariwala Saifuddin

Saifuddin Tariwala

Appellant and Defendant

Keith Martin Mack

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Daniel Alexander Friedlander

Attorney at The Law Offices of Danile Freidlander

29800 Agoura Road Suite 101

Castaic, CA 91310

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michael D. Kwasigroch

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Kwasigroch

1975 Royal Ave #4

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (736p.); R-3 (416p. e-filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 09/01/2021 By 33 Day(s) by VCSC Court Reporter (#10178) to file transcripts by 9-1-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Requested for 09/01/2021 By 33 Day(s) by VCSC Court Reporter (#10178) to file transcripts by 9-1-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of rescinding default dated 7-15-2021 by VCSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dated 6-3-2021 by VCSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of default on appeal dated 6-29-2021 by VCSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 6-3-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 5-20-2021; CT and RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: [SEE ORDER] . . . Appellant shall take immediate action to cure all defaults. If appellant fails to cure the defaults within fifteen (15) days of the date this order is filed, the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 10/18/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Keith Martin MackAttorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Keith Martin MackAttorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: By attorney M. Kwasigroch; motion for relief from default/failure to designate the record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Request for dismissal; Notice of failure to comply with CRC 8.140 dated 4-22-2021 by VCSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: ***DEFAULT*** / was due 4-8-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 4-5-2021 by VCSC re: failure to designate record/must cure by 4-20-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 3-3-21 from VCSC; Order on court fee waiver - granted (appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 3-1-21 from VCSC; Request to waive court fees; aplt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 3-23-21 by aplt. Mack; from 1-29-21 judgment after court trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2017-00501406-CU-OR-VTA; Trial Court Judge: O'Neill, Jr., Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwasigroch, Michael D.