This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/04/2021 at 14:32:27 (UTC).

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services v. The Superior Court of Sacramento County

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Sacramento County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mesiwala, Shama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2440

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mesiwala, Shama

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services

Respondent

The Superior Court of Sacramento County

Interested Parties

I. T.

S. W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nicole L. Roman

Interested Party Attorney

Kelly Leona Mieske

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final The superior court having complied with this court's order of September 11, 2020, the petition for writ of mandate is dismissed as moot. HULL, Acting P.J. (MMu)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Notes: The superior court having complied with this court's order of September 11, 2020, the petition for writ of mandate is dismissed as moot. HULL, Acting P.J. (MMu)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute orders dated 10/23/20 and 10/28/20; temporary placement and care of the child is vested with the Department of Child, Adult and Family Services pending the hearing under Welfare and Institutions Code 355 or further order of the court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order dated 10/7/20; court finds good cause to continue the matter to 10/21/20 for counsel for the minor to review discovery and have the opportunity to contact relatives, non-related extended family members, and service providers to ascertain the whereabouts and condition of the minor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order dated 10/1/20; court vacates the finding that the child would not benefit from appointment of counsel, vacates the detention findings and orders of 9/25/20, appoints counsel to represent the minor, and sets the initial hearing for 10/7/20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order dated 9/25/20; CLC2's request to be relieved as attorney of record for the minor is granted. Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) is appointed as a capta guardian ad litem.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Palma letter sent. Response due:; Notes: This court is considering issuing a peremptory writ of mandate in the first instance, i.e., without first issuing an alternative writ. (Palma v. U.S. Industrial Fasteners, Inc. (1984) 36 Cal.3d 171.) Respondent court may avoid issuance of the writ by (1) vacating its order granting a continuance of the initial hearing and entering a new and different order setting the matter for hearing within thirty (30) days of the date of this notice, and (2) appointing counsel for the minor or making findings explaining why the minor would not benefit from such appointment. Respondent court is requested to inform this court of any relevant action in the case that it takes consistent with this notice and to provide a status update on or before September 28, 2020. If respondent court chooses to proceed in the manner described herein, this court will dismiss the instant petition as moot. See full order for details. HULL, Acting P.J. (MMu)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order dated 9/4/20; initial hearing is continued to 11/6/20 at 8:30am in dept. 133.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order dated 8/21/20; 366.26 is continued to 9/1/20 at 8:30am in dept. 133.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 3 Vol. (306 pgs.) Filed with deficiencies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate. Request for immediate reversal of juvenile court order by August 21, 2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less