This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/15/2023 at 22:53:41 (UTC).

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services v. S.P.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services filed an Other lawsuit against P. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lindquist, Kristina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4114

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lindquist, Kristina

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services

Defendant and Appellant

S. P.

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

K. P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the County Counsel

Nicole L. Roman

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Elizabeth Wilkins Johnson

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Central California Appellate Program

Deborah Payne Cromer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal filed on May 6, 2021, is dismissed pursuant to In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835. Raye, P.J., Mauro, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. P. Attorney: Elizabeth Wilkins Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. P.Attorney: Elizabeth Wilkins Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 Vols. CT (397 pgs.) 1 Vol. RT (46 pgs.) Appellant's Opening Brief due July 6, 2021 CT consists of: Volume 1 (pgs.1-300) Volume 2 (pgs.301-397)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Elizabeth Wilkins Johnson appointed for appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed C.C.A.P. recommendation for counsel.; Notes: For Appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 5/6/2021. Juvenile dependency.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: JD241038; Trial Court Judge: Lindquist, Kristina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less