This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/25/2021 at 08:55:21 (UTC).

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services v. L.A.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services filed an Other lawsuit against L A. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Calabretta, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2724

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Third Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Calabretta, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services

Defendant and Appellant

L. A.

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

A. M.

Other

California Valley Miwok Tribe

10601 N. Escondido Place

Stockton, CA 95212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Office of the County Counsel

700 H Street, Suite 2650

Sacramento, CA 95814

Joanne C. East

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

3331 Power Inn Road, Suite 350

Sacramento, CA 95826

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Paul Adam Swiller

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1901 First Avenue, Suite 228

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Appellant's copy of the 2/3/21 dismissal order. Envelope marked "Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". Unable to locate an updated address for appellant. Placed in court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal filed on September 23, 2020, is dismissed pursuant to In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835. RAYE, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: L. A. Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: L. A.Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed application and order of:; Notes: Appelllant granted to 12/24/2020 to file appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, appellant's opening brief due November 30, 2020, respondent's brief due 30 days thereafter. Any minor's brief due 10 days after respondent's brief. Appellant's reply brief due 20 days after respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 4 vols. Clerk's Transcript (1052 pgs.) 1 vol. Reporter's Transcript (63 pgs.) Appellant's opening brief due: November 30, 2020. Clerk's Transcript consists of: Volume 1 (pgs. 1-300) Volume 2 (pgs. 301-600) Volume 3 (pgs. 601-900) Volume 4 (pgs. 901-1052)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: Received appellant's copy of the counsel appointment order and envelope stating "return to sender, no such number , unable to forward". Re-sent to appellant's updated address of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: Received appellant's copy of the record preparation order and return envelope stating "return to sender, no such number , unable to forward". Re-sent to appellant's updated address of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Modified address of:; Notes: Appellant per Sacramento County Superior Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Paul Adam Swiller for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, record to be received by October 16, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed C.C.A.P. recommendation for counsel.; Notes: For appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: adding California Valley Miwok Tribe to court service list.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 9/23/2020. Termination of parental rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: JD238816; Trial Court Judge: Calabretta, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Valley Miwok Tribe is a litigant

Latest cases where Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Central California Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Adam Swiller