This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/25/2023 at 04:23:02 (UTC).

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services v. J.J.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services filed an Other lawsuit against J J. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coggins, Dena. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5943

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coggins, Dena

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Sacramento County Department of Child, Family and Adult Services

Not Yet Classified, Appellants and Defendants

J. J.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jocelynn Joelle Maier

Nicole L. Roman

Office of the County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Gino V. deSolenni

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Katherine M. McLoughlin

Central California Appellate Program

 

Court Documents

C095943

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The filing of appellant's motion for pro se representation, filed on demand on May 1, 2023, is ordered stricken. There is a petition for review pending in the Supreme Court of California. Earl, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: By appellant for pro se representation. Filed on demand. (Motion stricken. See order filed 5/12/23)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed in Supreme Court.; Notes: By Appellant (S279348).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: 1 Vol.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Appellant (S279348).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed by opinion; Disposition Type: Final The appeal is dismissed.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Boulware Eurie, Stacy E.; Participants: Robie, Ronald B. (Concur) Mauro, Louis (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The appeal is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Deemed submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: Requests due: 2/14/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: On the court's own motion, the record on appeal is augmented to include the juvenile court's minute order dated December 6, 2022. The clerk of this court is directed to provide a copy of the minute order, previously provided to this court, to all counsel. Robie, Acting P.J., Boulware Eurie, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant granted extension to 08/29/22 to file Appellant's Opening Brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant requesting extension to 08/29/22 to file Appellant's Opening Brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Gino V. deSolenni appointed for appellant. Appellant's opening brief duue: 08/08/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Modified address of:; Notes: Appellant per CCAP recommendation for appointment of counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: For appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due: 07/05/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 vols. Clerk's Transcript (370 pp.) 11 Electronic Reporter's Transcript (237 pp.) Appellant's opening brief due 05/31/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 03/25/2022. Juvenile dependency.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: JD241457; Trial Court Judge: Coggins, Dena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less