This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/30/2023 at 18:07:00 (UTC).

R.V. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 R filed an Other lawsuit against v The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4394

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

R. V.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

A. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christina Z. Beede

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer K. Magee

Natalie Danielle Moore

Whitney M. Kulp

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2021

DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketDescription: No writ petition filed - juvenile dependency; Notes: Letter sent to counsel, petitioner and the trial court advising no petition having been filed, the case is closed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

DocketDescription: Filed scheduling order.; Notes: Petition due 8/16/21. Opposition due (PS) 10 days, or (MS) 15 days thereafter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: 2 vols. CT (581 pgs.); 1 vol. RT (303 pgs.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle Brann granted to 8/2/21.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle Brann to 8/2/21. Completed 0 out of 10 hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 6/21/21 as to lower court case number JV2020733. Record due: 7/12/21.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 6/21/21 as to lower court case number JV2020732. Record due: 7/12/21.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 6/21/21 as to lower court case number JV2020731. Record due: 7/12/21.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020733; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020732; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020731; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less