This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/01/2021 at 09:04:36 (UTC).

Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLP v. Jensen et al.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLP filed an Other lawsuit against Jensen. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bogdanoff, Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2981

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bogdanoff, Lee

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLP

Respondents

Wendy Jensen

Malibu, CA 90265

Sigrid Jensen

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Rita Jensen

Donna Marie Freedman

Gary Freedman

Jared Freedman

Karen Freedman

Patrick Marcus Jensen

Santa Monica Bank by Represented by their Successor in Interest US Bancorp

425 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Northern Trust Bank of California

201 South Lake Ave Ste. 600

Pasadena, CA 91101

Not Yet Classified

Marcus and Ramona Jensen Family Trust Dated November 10, 1993 Decedent's Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorney

Shabnam Sarah Broomer

Attorney at Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 1840

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent Attorneys

Marshal A. Oldman

Attorney at Oldman, Cooley, Sallus, Birnberg,Coleman & Gold, LLP

16133 Ventura Blvd. Penthouse

Encino, CA 91436

Margaret G. Lodise

Attorney at Sacks, Glazier, Franklin & Lodise

350 So. Grand Avenue, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Andrew Scheerer

Attorney at Sacks, Glazier, Franklin & Lodise LLP

350 S Grand Ave Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3475

Terrence M. Franklin

Attorney at Sacks Glazier Franklin & Lodise LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3475

Peter W. Ross

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tyler J King

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated July 12, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Santa Monica Bank By this form, a copy of which has been mailed to all parties, the corporation or other artificial or separate, legal entity identified below is given notice that it must secure legal representation to participate is this appeal. Santa Monica Bank is hereby notified that it is without counsel in the above captioned matter, and that if it wishes to participate in this appeal, it must serve and file a notice of representation before attempting to file any document in this court. (Merco Construction Engineers v. Municipal Court (1978) 21 Cal.3d 724; Paradise v. Nowlin (1948) 86 Cal.App.2d 897; Bus. & Prof. C. 6125.) If the above entity is an appellant and fails to serve and file notice of representation within 15 days of the date of this notice, its appeal will be dismissed as moot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Northern Trust Bank of California By this form, a copy of which has been mailed to all parties, the corporation or other artificial or separate, legal entity identified below is given notice that it must secure legal representation to participate is this appeal. Northern Trust Bank of California is hereby notified that it is without counsel in the above captioned matter, and that if it wishes to participate in this appeal, it must serve and file a notice of representation before attempting to file any document in this court. (Merco Construction Engineers v. Municipal Court (1978) 21 Cal.3d 724; Paradise v. Nowlin (1948) 86 Cal.App.2d 897; Bus. & Prof. C. 6125.) If the above entity is an appellant and fails to serve and file notice of representation within 15 days of the date of this notice, its appeal will be dismissed as moot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLP Attorney: Shabnam Sarah Broomer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLPAttorney: Shabnam Sarah Broomer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Cutler, Stefanie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 4/19/2021 by Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STPB03915; Trial Court Judge: Bogdanoff, Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STPB04080; Trial Court Judge: Bogdanoff, Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ruttenberg Cutler Broomer, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHERN TRUST BANK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant