This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/24/2022 at 04:07:35 (UTC).

Rumshiskaya v. Nafal

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Rumshiskaya filed an Other lawsuit against Nafal. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Griffin, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0188

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Griffin, Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Rivka Shoshana Rumshiskaya

Defendant and Respondent

Suhair M. Nafal

Not Yet Classified

Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring St., Room 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Steven Thomas Gebelin

Attorney at Lesowitz & Gebelin LLP

8383 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 800

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-3085

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Haytham Faraj

Attorney at The Law Offices of Haytham Faraj

1935 W. Belmont Ave

Chicago, IL 60657

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Attorney at Attorney General - ANTI-SLAPP

300 S. Spring St., Room 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: all documents scanned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal in this court, the appeal is DISMISSED. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 4 CT (pgs. 1 - 972) - ELECTRONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS - incorrect judgment date included.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant Rivka Shoshana Rumshiskaya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01159914; Trial Court Judge: Griffin, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Office of the Attorney General is a litigant