This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/22/2023 at 01:00:43 (UTC).

Ruiz v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 Ruiz filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4048

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ismael Ruiz

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Michael Eyre

Interested Party

13323 Imperial Highway V1, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anthony A. Sears

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorney

Patrick William Kelly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed October 24, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed October 24, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less