Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/27/2021 at 15:18:47 (UTC).

RUDISILL v. CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION (LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS)

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 RUDISILL filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6459

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Jenni Hawk

Robin Rudisill

Appellants and Interested Parties

Lighthouse Brooks, LLC

California Coastal Commission

Ramin Kolahi

Defendant and Appellant

California Coastal Commission

Not Yet Classified

Gains & Stacey, LLP

16633 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1220

Encino, CA 91436

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Sabrina Diane Venskus

Attorney at Venskus & Associates, PC

1055 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1660

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Interested Party Attorneys

Lisa A. Weinberg

Attorney at Gaines & Stacey LLP

16633 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1220

Encino, CA 91436

Thomas A. Nitti

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas A. Nitti

1250 Sixth Street, Suite 305

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1637

Wyatt Evan Sloan-Tribe

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Wyatt Evan Sloan-Tribe

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed); Notes: The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: California Coastal Commission Attorney: Wyatt Evan Sloan-Tribe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Ramin Kolahi Attorney: Lisa A. Weinberg Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Lighthouse Brooks, LLC Attorney: Lisa A. Weinberg Pub/Depublication Requestor: Gains & Stacey, LLP Attorney: Lisa A. Weinberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B294460; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BS168074

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gains & Stacey, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COASTALCOMMISSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WYATT E. SLOAN-TRIBE