This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/22/2023 at 13:01:19 (UTC).

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Villarreal, Lydia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9429

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Villarreal, Lydia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Monterey County

Interested Party

AquaLegacy Development LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

William Daniel Coffee

Janet Elizabeth Humphrey

Interested Party Attorneys

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Aaron Robert Gruber

Dylan James Crosby

Jonathan R. Bass

Hannah L. Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or certiorari, or other appropriate relief is denied. (FDE, AMG, CEW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: ACE Attorney Service, Inc. on behalf of AquaLegacy Development LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: AquaLegacy Development LLC's preliminary opposition to writ petitions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Letter to superior court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on Respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: ***CORRECTED EXHIBITS*** Volumes 7 of 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits - Volume 7 of 7 (bookmarks needed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition, Certiorari and/or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less