This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/21/2023 at 11:07:34 (UTC).

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Villarreal, Lydia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9429

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Villarreal, Lydia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Monterey County

Monterey County Courts 1200 Aguajito Road

Monterey, CA 93940

Interested Party

AquaLegacy Development LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

William Daniel Coffee

Attorney at Songstad, Randall, Coffee & Humphrey LLP

3200 Park Center Dr Ste 950

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Janet Elizabeth Humphrey

Attorney at Songstad Randall Coffee & Humphrey LLP

3200 Park Center Dr Ste 950

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Interested Party Attorneys

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

1 Montgomery St Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104-5500

Aaron Robert Gruber

Attorney at Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP

1700 S El Camino Real Ste 150

San Mateo, CA 94402

Dylan James Crosby

Attorney at Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP

1700 S El Camino Real Ste 150

San Mateo, CA 94402

Jonathan R. Bass

Attorney at COBLENTZ PATCH DUFFY & BASS LLP

1 Montgomery Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94101

Hannah L. Jones

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

1 Montgomery St Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104-5500

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or certiorari, or other appropriate relief is denied. (FDE, AMG, CEW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: ACE Attorney Service, Inc. on behalf of AquaLegacy Development LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: AquaLegacy Development LLC's preliminary opposition to writ petitions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Letter to superior court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on Respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: ***CORRECTED EXHIBITS*** Volumes 7 of 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits - Volume 7 of 7 (bookmarks needed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition, Certiorari and/or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less