This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/13/2023 at 12:04:16 (UTC).

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. AquaLegacy Development LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AquaLegacy Development LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Villarreal, Lydia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2566

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Villarreal, Lydia

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

AquaLegacy Development LLC

2012 Canrow Owner, LLC

Medallion Servicing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

William Daniel Coffee

Janet Elizabeth Humphrey

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Hannah L. Jones

Dylan James Crosby

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Sean David Unger

Katharine T Van Dusen

David J. Bowie

Eric Conrad Schaffer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Case transferred out of district; Disposition Type: Final The following matters, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, are transferred to the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case.; Notes: The following matters, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, are transferred to the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Supreme Court requesting transfer of this case to the Sixth Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: William D. Coffee, appellant's counsel - requests oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Sean D. Unger, counsel for respondent requests oral argument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Dylan J. Crosby substitutes in for Aaron R. Gruber as counsel for AquaLegacy Development, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of appearance of Sean D. Unger of Paul Hastings LLP on behalf of Appellant and Respondent AquaLegacy Development LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: The case fully briefed date reflects the date the case was transferred to the Second District Court of Appeal.case fully briefed on 6/8/2022 in Sixth Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: ***CORRECTED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUPERSEDEAS*** Volumes 7 of 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits in support of petition for writ of supersedeas (7 vols.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Appellant's petition for writ of supersedeas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal number H049368 is hereby ordered to be considered together with appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 (see order filed July 22, 2021 in each of these dockets) for purposes of oral argument and briefing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Considered with case # H048978, H049062, H049160 and H049368

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 are hereby ordered considered together for purposes of oral argument and disposition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ruby Falls Fund, LLC Attorney: Janet Elizabeth Humphrey Attorney: William Daniel Coffee (3/4/21 jmt; no pos attached; 3/23/21 noa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ruby Falls Fund, LLCAttorney: Janet Elizabeth Humphrey Attorney: William Daniel Coffee; Notes: (3/4/21 jmt; no pos attached; 3/23/21 noa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 3/23/2021 - NOA Ruby Falls Fund, Inc..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Monterey County Superior Court; County: Monterey; Trial Court Case Number: 16CV001078; Trial Court Judge: Villarreal, Lydia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less