This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/07/2022 at 04:37:26 (UTC).

AquaLegacy Development LLC v. Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 AquaLegacy Development LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Ruby Falls Fund, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Villarreal, Lydia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9517

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Villarreal, Lydia

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

AquaLegacy Development LLC

Appellant and Defendant

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Other

2012 Canrow Owner, LLV, a California Limited Liability, Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan R. Bass

Attorney at COBLENTZ PATCH DUFFY & BASS LLP

1 Montgomery Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94101

Dylan James Crosby

Attorney at Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP

1700 S El Camino Real Ste 150

San Mateo, CA 94402

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

1 Montgomery St Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104-5500

Hannah L. Jones

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

1 Montgomery St Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104-5500

Aaron Robert Gruber

Attorney at Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP

1700 S El Camino Real Ste 150

San Mateo, CA 94402

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

William Daniel Coffee

Attorney at Songstad, Randall, Coffee & Humphrey LLP

3200 Park Center Dr Ste 950

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Janet Elizabeth Humphrey

Attorney at Songstad Randall Coffee & Humphrey LLP

3200 Park Center Dr Ste 950

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Other Attorneys

David James Bowie

Attorney at Bowie & Schaffer

2255 Contra Costa Blvd., Suite 305

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Eric Conrad Schaffer

Attorney at Bowie & Schaffer

2255 Contra Costa Blvd # 305

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Certificate of compliance, filed 1/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Notice of Default to Respondent, Filed 12/13/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS missing judgment or order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Ruby Falls Fund, LLC Filed 10/29/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Monterey County Superior Court; County: Monterey; Trial Court Case Number: 16CV001078; Trial Court Judge: Villarreal, Lydia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less