This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/31/2023 at 00:09:54 (UTC).

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC v. AquaLegacy Development LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Ruby Falls Fund, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AquaLegacy Development LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Villarreal, Lydia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8978

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Villarreal, Lydia

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

Medallion Servicing, LLC

2012 Canrow Owner, LLC

AquaLegacy Development LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

William Daniel Coffee

Janet Elizabeth Humphrey

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Eric Conrad Schaffer

David James Bowie

Sean David Unger

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Katharine T Van Dusen

Dylan James Crosby

Aaron Robert Gruber

Hannah L. Jones

 

Court Documents

H048978

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed in Full; Disposition Type: Final In H049160, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed and the matter is remanded to the trial court for the limited purpose of allowing Canrow, upon appropriate motion or other appropriate procedure, to obtain an order for 36 reformation of the trustee's deed recorded November 19, 2014, to correct the error identifying Medallion Silver, LLC as the trustee. In H048978, Ruby Falls v. AquaLegacy, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed. In H049062, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is affirmed. In H049368, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the August 12, 2021 order awarding attorney fees to AquaLegacy is reversed.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Greenwood, Mary J.; Participants: Grover, Adrienne M. (Concur) Lie, Cynthia C. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) In H049160, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed and the matter is remanded to the trial court for the limited purpose of allowing Canrow, upon appropriate motion or other appropriate procedure, to obtain an order for 36 reformation of the trustee's deed recorded November 19, 2014, to correct the error identifying Medallion Silver, LLC as the trustee. In H048978, Ruby Falls v. AquaLegacy, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed. In H049062, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is affirmed. In H049368, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the August 12, 2021 order awarding attorney fees to AquaLegacy is reversed. (MJG, AMG, CCL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Counsel David Bowie in case Nos. H049062, H049160, H049368 is changing from personal appearance to remote appearance.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument rescheduled; Notes: On the court's own motion, oral argument in the above-entitled cause originally scheduled for Thursday, January 5, 2023, is rescheduled to Thursday, February 16, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. Courtroom entrance will be restricted to counsel and self-represented litigants presenting in-person oral argument only. Counsel and self-represented litigants appearing in person must wear masks and may remove them when addressing the Court during their oral argument. Court staff will be masked, and the Justices will be masked as appropriate during oral argument. Parties who have opted to appear remotely will receive detailed information on how to participate through the BlueJeans Video Conferencing platform.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: Oral argument in the above-entitled cause will be heard on Thursday, January 5, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. Courtroom entrance will be restricted to counsel and self-represented litigants presenting in-person oral argument only. Counsel and self-represented litigants appearing in person must wear masks and may remove them when addressing the Court during their oral argument. Court staff will be masked, and the Justices will be masked as appropriate during oral argument. Parties who have opted to appear remotely will receive detailed information on how to participate through the BlueJeans Video Conferencing platform.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: William D. Coffee for appellant (15 minutes - personal appearance).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Appellant's petition for writ of supersedeas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Filed 09/14/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal number H049368 is hereby ordered to be considered together with appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 (see order filed July 22, 2021 in each of these dockets) for purposes of oral argument and briefing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Considered with case #; Notes: H048978, H049062, H049160 and H049368

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 are hereby ordered considered together for purposes of oral argument and disposition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Ruby Falls Fund, Inc., Filed 3/23/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Monterey County Superior Court; County: Monterey; Trial Court Case Number: 16CV001078; Trial Court Judge: Villarreal, Lydia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less