This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/10/2022 at 02:39:07 (UTC).

R.T. v. The Superior Court; DPSS

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 R T filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court DPSS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, Cheryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7628

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Murphy, Cheryl

 

Party Details

Petitioner

R. T.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Not Yet Classified

L. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kimberly Lore Hasler

Attorney at Juvenile Defense Panel

9991-A County Farm Road

Riverside, CA 92503

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Sarah Catherine Schuler

9991-A County Farm Rd

Riverside, CA 92503-3506

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: ***Discard extra copies of writ.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to letter filed by counsel for petitioner, the petition is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: dtd Sep 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: NIS - must be paginated; correct title/caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: dtd Sep 7, 2021 re omitted documents from the clerk's transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1. (51 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-3. (636 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: ***8.452***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Aug 20, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Aug 27, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: dtd Aug 27, 2021; R.T. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIJ2100031; Trial Court Judge: Murphy, Cheryl

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Catherine Schuler