This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/30/2022 at 21:21:14 (UTC).

ROSS v. FOX

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 ROSS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against FOX. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1189

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Jerry Ross

Eric Ross

Jenny Zipkin

Alan Fox

ACF Property Management, Inc.

Appellants and Defendants

Alan Fox

ACF Property Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Richard C. Leonard

Attorney at Leonard, Dicker & Schreiber LLP

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3963

Steven A. Schuman

Attorney at Leonard Dicker & Schreiber LLP

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3963

Margaret Holly Thompson

Attorney at Munger, Tolles, & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark R Yohalem

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John L. Schwab

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James H. Turken

1875 Century Park East Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Margaret Holly Thompson

Attorney at Munger, Tolles, & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark R Yohalem

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John L. Schwab

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James H. Turken

1875 Century Park East Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (vol. 3 of 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (vol. 2 of 3), 1 file jacket (1 of 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alan Fox Attorney: Mark R Yohalem Defendant and Appellant: ACF Property Management, Inc. Attorney: Mark R Yohalem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jerry Ross Attorney: Richard C. Leonard Plaintiff and Appellant: Eric Ross Attorney: Richard C. Leonard Plaintiff and Appellant: Jenny Zipkin Attorney: Richard C. Leonard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 2 doghouses (vol. 2 and 3), file jacket (1 of 3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alan Fox Attorney: Mark R Yohalem Defendant and Appellant: ACF Property Management, Inc. Attorney: Mark R Yohalem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B298873; Disposition: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC576879

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark R Yohalem

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L. Schwab