This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/08/2023 at 14:01:13 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 Rodriguez filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3187

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Victoria Rodriguez

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Interested Party

Huhtamaki, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ann A. Hull

Jeffrey Marc Schwartz

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Presiding Judge

Interested Party Attorney

Karimah Jamilah-Akilah Lamar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on September 15, 2022, and the amended petition filed on September 16, 2022. Petitioner does not demonstrate that her petition is timely (see Code Civ. Proc., 437c, subd. (m)(1)) and she does not otherwise demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied. STRATTON, P. J. GRIMES, J. HARUTUNIAN, J.* * Judge of the San Diego Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: [AMENDED] PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF **Duplicate copy in compliance with Electronic Formatting Requirements and Guidelines of the Second District-Pursuant to California Rules of Court rules 8.72(a) and 8.74(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Non-compliance sent to Petitioner's counsel regarding no bookmarks on the petition for writ and no proof of service on trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Petitioner Victoria Rodriguez.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less