This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/01/2023 at 23:24:22 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ v. SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 RODRIGUEZ filed an Other lawsuit against SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8796

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Irma Rodriguez

Respondent and Defendant

Sacramento Municipal Utility District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Boris Treyzon

Attorney at Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo LLP

16001 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 200

Encino, CA 91436-4482

Cynthia Ann Goodman

Attorney at Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 935

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Douglas Adam Rochen

Attorney at Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 935

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Alan W. Foutz

Attorney at Murphy Campbell Alliston and Quinn

8801 Folsom Boulevard, Suite 230

Sacramento, CA 95826

Stephanie Lynn Quinn

Attorney at Murphy Campbell Alliston and Quinn

8801 Folsom Boulevard, Suite 230

Sacramento, CA 95826

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned and re-sent; Notes: Boris Treyzon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Sacramento Municipal Utility District Attorney: Alan W. Foutz **Court of Appeal recommends the opinion not be published on the ground it does not meet the standards of publication.**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C087573; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34201800233438

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less