This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 06:03:51 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Individually and as heir and Successor-in-Interest to Agustina Rodriguez, Deceased v. CF Watsonville West LLC dba Watsonville Post Acute Center

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Rodriguez, Individually and as heir and Successor-in-Interest to Agustina Rodriguez, Deceased filed an Other lawsuit against CF Watsonville West LLC dba Watsonville Post Acute Center. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Volkmann, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0581

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Volkmann, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Raymond Rodriguez, Individually and as heir and Successor-in-Interest to Agustina Rodriguez, Deceased

Appellant and Defendant

CF Watsonville West LLC dba Watsonville Post Acute Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Dawn Marie Smith

Attorney at Smith Clinesmith LLP

325 N. Saint Paul Street, 29Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Lann Gottesman McIntyre

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Kathleen Marie Walker

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Tracy Diana Forbath

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-8198

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final The joint request to dismiss the above-referenced appeal is granted. The appeal filed on November 21, 2022, is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. The remittitur shall issue forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The joint request to dismiss the above-referenced appeal is granted. The appeal filed on November 21, 2022, is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. The remittitur shall issue forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Stipulation for dismissal of appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No response to OSC as of 1/9/22. Notice of settlement filed in this court on 12/22/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: On December 22, 2022, the Court was notified that the parties have settled the above entitled appeal. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.244, subdivision (a)(3), appellant must file a notice of abandonment or request to dismiss appeal within 45 days from December 22, 2022. The parties are advised that failure to file the notice of abandonment/request to dismiss, or a letter stating good cause why the court should not dismiss the appeal within this prescribed time, shall result in the dismissal of the appeal on the court's own motion. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244, subd. (a)(4).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: Appellant is ordered to show cause by letter brief filed within 15 days from the date of this order why this appeal should not be dismissed as premature, as the minute order directs the preparation of a written order. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104(c)(1), (d).) Appellant may provide a copy of the trial court's written order in lieu of a response.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Civil case information statement received, appellant, minute order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: CF Watsonville West LLC dba Watsonville Post Acute Center, filed 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Cruz County Superior Court; County: Santa Cruz; Trial Court Case Number: 21CV02349; Trial Court Judge: Volkmann, Timothy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less