This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/16/2022 at 00:34:26 (UTC).

Robles v. Davis-Holmes et al.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Robles filed an Other lawsuit against Davis-Holmes. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4163

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Albert Robles

Carson, CA 90745-7162

Appellants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

Albert Robles

Carson, CA 90745-7162

Lula Davis-Holmes

Harry Holmes

Respondents, Defendants and Appellants

Lula Davis-Holmes

Harry Holmes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Rickey Ivie

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2919

Byron Michael Purcell

Attorney at Ivie, Mcneill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: (Cross-Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: (Cross-Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: (Appeal 7/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 23, 2021 - (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Partial (Appeal 7/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed July 22, 2021, is dismissed.(Appeal 7/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Sep 1, 2021 (Appeal 7/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Lula Davis-Holmes Attorney: Byron Michael Purcell Defendant and Appellant: Harry Holmes (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on September 16, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing fee paid via credit card for Lula Davis-Holmes (X).

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Lula Davis-HolmesAttorney: Byron Michael Purcell Defendant and Appellant: Harry Holmes; Notes: (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Rickey Ivie, Counsel for Cross-Appellant, Lula Davis-Holmes Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt This Court received the enclosed check number 026582 dated September 10, 2021 in the amount of $775.00. The check is made payable to "LASC". Checks submitted to cover the appeal filing fee should be made payable to "Court of Appeal". Therefore, we are returning the voided check to you at the above address. You may send us a replacement check or the court accepts credit card payment by telephone. If you elect to pay by credit card, please call, the Clerk's Office at 213-830-7000. If the filing fee is not paid by September 20, 2021, the cross appeal filed on August 13, 2021 (X) will be dismissed. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(c)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aug. 13, 2021: Lula Davis Holmes, et al. - (X)**Cross appeal**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 17, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Albert Robles Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Albert RoblesPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# 216358 for $775.00 (ACE Attorney Service, Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 7/22/2021 by Albert Robles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV41667; Trial Court Judge: Fujie, Holly

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer IVIE RICKEY ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PURCELL BYRON MICHAEL