This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/10/2022 at 03:30:29 (UTC).

ROBINSON ON DISCIPLINE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 ROBINSON ON DISCIPLINE was filed as a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7819

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Russell Alan Robinson

San Francisco, CA 94102-4462

Respondent

State Bar of California

180 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Russell Alan Robinson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

345 Grove Street, Fl 1

San Francisco, CA 94102-4462

Respondent Attorneys

Office of General Counsel - State Bar

180 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

State Bar of California/Membership

180 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Office of the State Bar Court

Attorney at Attn: Tammy Cleaver, Court Services Analyst

845 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: to the State Bar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed; Notes: The order filed on June 30, 2021 is hereby amended as to the State Bar case numbers as follows: State Bar Court Nos. 15-O-15368 (16-O-12414; 16-O-12978); 17-O-01203 (17-O-07288); 18-O-11996 (Consolidated))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied; disbarred

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; disbarred; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The court orders that Russell Alan Robinson (Respondent), State Bar Number 163937, is disbarred from the practice of law in California and that Respondent's name is stricken from the roll of attorneys. Respondent must make restitution to the following payees or such other recipient as may be designated by the Office of Probation or the State Bar Court (or reimburse the Client Security Fund, to the extent of any payment from the Fund to such payee, in accordance with Business and Professions Code section 6140.5). Reimbursement to the Fund is enforceable as a money judgment and may be collected by the State Bar through any means permitted by law: (1) Elisa Turesin in the amount of $7,500 plus 10 percent interest per year from April 23, 2015; (2) Robert Boyd in the amount of $11,000 plus 10 percent interest per year from January 8, 2018; (3) Bruce Kyles in the amount of $47,462.62 plus 10 percent interest per year from February 17, 2015; (4) Dennis Hightower in the amount of $13,000 plus 10 percent interest per year from October 31, 2017; and (5) Dr. Yagya Kapila in the amount of $143,368.60 plus 10 percent interest per year from December 27, 2017. Respondent must also comply with California Rules of Court, rule 9.20, and perform the acts specified in subdivisions (a) and (c) of that rule within 30 and 40 calendar days, respectively, after the effective date of this order. Costs are awarded to the State Bar in accordance with Business and Professions Code section 6086.10 and are enforceable both as provided in Business and Professions Code section 6140.7 and as a money judgment, and may be collected by the State Bar through any means permitted by law.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter dated May 11, 2021, from State Bar of California, James Chang. Informing the Court that the State Bar does not intend to submit an answer to this petition unless requested by the Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Russell Alan Robinson Attorney: Russell Alan Robinson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record of State Bar discipline filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant